+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/EDU/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 250).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor