+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 205, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Act 205, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 879).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, Takumi, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; L. Thielen, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, C. Lee, Takumi, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Eli, Ward.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 674) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1778) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:05AM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1065), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa.
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 329.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor