+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.