+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 020, 4/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Act 020, on 4/18/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 423).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-03-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 246).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to HTH/TEC, CPN.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506), recommending referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor