+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor