+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Woodson, Ward.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-17-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito, Brower, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-02-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor