+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HRE/EDU, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor