+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor