+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 325.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Kouchi.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Johanson.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 16; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Solomon . Noes, 9 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1400) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 9:45AM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Johanson, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Kobayashi, McDermott, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Fukumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor