+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Act 133, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 133, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 149).
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 149) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in conference room 224.
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 2:05PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1482) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1088) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, Kidani.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 280).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 353), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor