+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Friday, 02-06-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor