+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, San Buenaventura, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 889) in amended form (SD 2).
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19.
- Report filed.
- Separated Committee Report.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2), with Senator Fevella voting "No".
- Floor Amendment No. 12 offered.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1914) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor