+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 204).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor