+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor