+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.