+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor