+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor