+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 60).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 11
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor