+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Recommitted to CPC with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred one day 03-11-21.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.