+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HET, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor