+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 11:30AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, S. Chang, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Yamane, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Todd, Thielen.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 760) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from HOU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1945) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to HOU/WAM.
- Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to HOU/WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/WTL, HOU/WAM.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 201).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor