+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
- The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 257).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Lowen, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-15-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 16
- Recommitted to EDB with none voting no and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused.
- Recommends recommittal to EDB.
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62-18) as amended in HD 1.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-02-18 11:30AM in conference room 309.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor