+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor