+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 043, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Act 043, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 130).
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Luke, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Kidani.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Tupola.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17 at 2:15PM.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor