+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 11:00AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13 at 11AM.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor