+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Act 115, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 151) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 151).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864).
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 229.
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 754) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1877) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor