+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- Act 154, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 154, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 154).
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 154) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Ihara, English, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Ihara, English Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 687) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1702) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 126).
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor