+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, CPH.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Ichiyama.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor