+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 400) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor