+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-13-15 10:30AM in conference room 309.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-15.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-15.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.