+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Branco, McKelvey, Sayama, Tam, Tarnas voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Holt, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Wildberger voting no (10) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
- Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Woodson; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor