+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 050, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Act 050, on 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 457).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from HMS/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/TEC.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7).
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Ohno, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.