+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 212, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Act 212, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 757).
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 12:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kidani, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carroll, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Cachola, McDermott.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 500) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-09-13.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor