+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 390).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor