+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 149) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.