+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229.
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 37).
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.