+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor