+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:45PM in conference room 224.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 1:45PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; L. Thielen, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Inouye, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1482) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kahele.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 200).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Jordan, Keohokalole, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.