+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Ito, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor