+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 2:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 231).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor