+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Tupola.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, Pouha, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor