+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 172), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Ito.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor