+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:10PM in conference room 329.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; K. Kahele.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Taniguchi.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-06-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 3:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 103).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-06-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor