+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Onishi, Ward.
- Re-referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Inouye, Baker Co-Chairs; Riviere, Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1529) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Slom.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-20-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-15.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-23-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-18-15 4:00PM in conference room 325.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor