+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor