+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH/HEA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 10:30AM in House conference room 308.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor