+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decison-making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor