+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/PSM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145).
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman.
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to AGR/WAL, referral sheet 10
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, WAL, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor