+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA, JDL.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-25-15 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-20-15 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Nakashima.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 1:05PM in room 325.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:05PM in conference room 325.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Jordan, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 349), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 11:35AM in House conference room 325.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-15 11:35AM.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-11-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Re-referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 11
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor