+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-30-15 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 8:45AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Ruderman Co-Chair; Inouye, Wakai, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Lowen Co-Chairs; Onishi, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 542) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 49).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor